Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ark204 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Anderson, Jeffrey Robert, Goffe, Trusha Patel, Shaikh, Nahid Aftab, against Archdiocese Of New York, Does 1-5 Whose Identities Are Unknown To Plaintiff, Santa Maria, represented by Filiberti, Joanne, Loveless, John J A M, Ross, Kenneth Scott, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge J. Silver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: September 18, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: October 14, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION) Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Order Concerning Liaison Counsel for NYC - Hon. George J. Silver |
||
April 05, 2021 |
ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
||
October 14, 2020 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J. Silver (Directing Master Index Number) |
||
September 18, 2020 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
||
August 31, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
August 28, 2020 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice to Take Oral Deposition - ARK204 DOE - Santa Maria |
||
August 28, 2020 | Answer - ARK204 DOE - Santa Maria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.