Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ark162 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Anderson, Jeffrey Robert, Goffe, Trusha Patel, Shaikh, Nahid Aftab, against Archdiocese Of New York, Does 1-5 Whose Identities Are Unknown To Plaintiff, Parish Of St. Brendan And St. Ann, Parish Of Sts. Peter And Paul And Assumption, St. Ann, (total of 6) See All represented by Clarke, Christopher Delamere, Filiberti, Joanne, Maddaluno, Anthony R., Ross, Kenneth Scott, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge J. Silver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This is a complaint filed in New York County, New York, on June 10, 2020, under Index No. 950147/2020. It is brought pursuant to the New York Child Victims Act, CPLR § 214-g, and the basis of venue is the principal place of business of Defendant Arch...
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 23, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: October 14, 2020NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 14, 2020ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION)
Date: April 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 10, 2023ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 22, 2023ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION)
Date: July 10, 2022ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: September 18, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 23, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: June 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
May 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION) Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Order Concerning Liaison Counsel for NYC - Hon. George J. Silver |
||
April 05, 2021 |
ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
||
October 14, 2020 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J. Silver (Directing Master Index Number) |
||
September 18, 2020 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
||
September 14, 2020 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.