Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Natalie Huntley Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of Devon J. Hyman, Deceased, Natalie Huntley Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of Devon J. Hyman, Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bondi-Stoddard, Annamarie, Kardisch, Josh Hugh, Mira, Isabel Cristina, Nielsen, Gerhardt Meyer, against New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, represented by Braverman, Dylan Corey, Diven, Michael Paul, Faillace, Charles K., Sanchez, Andres Jaime, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Erika M. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErika M. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 21, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 08, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
June 20, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
January 25, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
October 20, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
August 02, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
June 07, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
May 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of non party EBT - Manish Tandon |
||
May 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of non party EBT - Victoria Golovatenko |
||
May 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of non party EBT - Albert Liu |
||
May 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of non party EBT - Margi Patel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.