Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ana Ramos, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Linden, Jason Andrew, against New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, represented by Mandell, Steven C., Tock, William Christian, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Lynn R. Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R. Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: March 31, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
April 21, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
April 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition w/ word count certification |
||
March 31, 2021 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE | ||
January 21, 2021 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) Request to So Order Stipulation |
||
January 15, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) LETTER OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE |
||
January 08, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 08, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) LETTER FOR SERVICE |
||
January 06, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.