Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Michele L. Debartolo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kaye, Andrew Charles, against Mezzion Pharmaceuticals, Inc., represented by Shapiro, Peter T., in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Gerald Lebovits presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald Lebovits Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 16, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
October 27, 2022 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
October 13, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause |
||
October 13, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of Peter T. Shapiro |
||
October 13, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) Statement of Authorization |
||
October 13, 2022 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
October 13, 2022 |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
October 07, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
September 23, 2022 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.