Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ashleyann Berrios, Deanna Flores, filed a(n) Wage and Hour - Labor and Employment case represented by Sattiraju, Ravi, against Abc Corps. 1-10, Dinosaur Restaurants, Llc, Jane & John Does 1-20, Xyz Companies. 1-10, represented by Greenky, Ross Michael, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Arlene P. Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene P. Bluth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Ny Wage And Hour Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeWage and Hour |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
March 02, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Stephen Lloyd Payroll |
||
March 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Lizette Lebron Payroll Records |
||
March 02, 2023 | MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
March 02, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
March 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
February 22, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
February 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
February 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Plaintiff Ashleyann Berrios Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.