Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
18 E. 69Th St Tenant Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bassen, Ned H, Spiegel, Glenn Harlan, against Aryeh Realty Corp., Benjamin Aryeh, represented by Fischman, Doreen Joy, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Lucy Billings presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLucy Billings Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 19, 2022SUMMONS
Date: September 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004) Affirmation of Doreen J. Fischman affirmed January 3, 2023 |
||
January 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Benjamin Aryeh sworn to January 2, 2023 |
||
January 03, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004) by Doreen J Fischman dated January 2, 2023 |
||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Letter from NYS Secretary of State dated December 21, 2022 |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Exhibit 1 to NB Reply Affirmation |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Exhibit 3 to NB Reply Affirmation |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Exhibit 3 to NB Reply Affirmation |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Exhibit 1 to NB Reply Affirmation |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Exhibit 4 to NB Reply Affirmation |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Exhibit 1 to NB Reply Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.