Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chuck W Lee, Elaine Choy Lee, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Weber, Howard B, against Alexander Behrens, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Richard G. Latin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard G. Latin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Consumer Credit) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: May 10, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 12, 2022DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: May 10, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 30, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 06, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 30, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 08, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 01, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 30, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 21, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 21, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 21, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 22, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: July 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: May 09, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 20, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 06, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: February 01, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Defendant Affidavit in Opposition to Motion to Amend Plaintiffs Complaint |
||
February 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 LT Non Payment Action 301653-23/NY filed 01/23/2023 |
||
February 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 OSC Directing Plaintiffs Correction of Violations | Counter Defendant HP Action_61432222 filed 12/29 OSC Directing Plaintiffs Correction of Violations | Counter Defendant HP Action_61432222 filed 12/29 ... show more |
||
February 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 DHPD Open Violation Report Status 02/08/2023 |
||
February 02, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
February 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Proposed Amended Complaint |
||
December 30, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 08, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.