Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Resnick Gracie Mews Llc,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Krassner, Mark, against Xxxxxxxxxxxx, Xxxxx Xxxxxxx, represented by Gribben, Jesse Douglass, Xxxxxxx, Xxxxx, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Laurence L. Love presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurence L. Love Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
October 05, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
September 15, 2021 | STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
September 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deed |
||
August 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.