Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Riemer & Braunstein Llp, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Isser, Steven D, Poynor, Alissa Lightner, against Bluco Energy Llc, Gocom Corporation, Isaac Sutton, Tarsier Energy Ltd, Tarsier Ltd, (total of 5) See All represented by Altman, Steven, Fein, Shari Beth, Jakub, Louis Edward, Mcnamara, Susan Margaret, Sutton, Isaac H, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Margaret Chan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Chan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management464 days |
Filing DateJune 19, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Enforcment Of Judgmemt) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions535 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time963 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 17, 2017RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Hearing |
REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 11AM NYSCEF DOC 114 Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
December 16, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 10:30AM NYSCEF DOC 110 Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | |
January 15, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 33 9:30AM W/STATUS CONF Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
January 15, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 33 10AM W/MOT 4 Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
December 18, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE 9:30AM W/STATUS CONF Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Print outs from web sites |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.