Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Teresa Taylor Products, Inc., Tmt Products, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Schulman, Jeffrey Louis, against Medical Depot, Inc. D B A Drive Medical Design And Manufacturing, represented by Levy, Jeffrey N, Pena, Melissa A, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Saliann Scarpulla presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSaliann Scarpulla Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management83 days |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1252 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 17, 2018STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 03, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2019 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE STATUS CONFERENCE 39 2:15 STIP FILED Judge: SCARPULLA, SALIANN |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 39 2:15PM Judge: SCARPULLA, SALIANN |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 03, 2018 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 39 2:15 SEE STIP |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 25, 2018 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 39 Judge: SCARPULLA, SALIANN |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Complaint |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation (Request to So Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.