Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler Llp, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kleban, David Samuel, Lowenthal, Daniel Abraham, against Brian L. Cinelli, David P. Marcus, John Does # 1-99, Marcus & Cinelli Llp, represented by Adoff, Aaron Morris, Cinelli, Brian, Marcus, David Paul, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Arlene P. Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene P. Bluth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Fraudulent Conveyance) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 02, 2022SUMMONS
Date: August 02, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #007) *Corrected* Notice of Appeal |
||
May 01, 2023 | Notice of Appeal | ||
April 20, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
April 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
April 10, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter From David Kleban to Justice Bluth |
||
April 04, 2023 | Notice of Entry of the Decision and Order, dated March 29, 2023 | ||
April 04, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 16, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.