Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Exrp 14 Holdings Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cyrulnik, Jason Colin, Fattaruso, Paul, against Ls-14 Ave Llc, represented by Mcdougall, Jennifer Marie, O'Connor, Paul M, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa Anne Crane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - G CLOSING NOTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 01, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 01, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 09, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 30, 2023 |
ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR Amended Order of Reference to Commercial Division ADR Program |
||
January 26, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
January 25, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter from Jennifer McDougall to the Court Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference |
||
January 20, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Purchase and Sale Agreement |
||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #002) Notice of Appeal of the Decision and Order Denying the Motion to Vacate the Lis Pendens |
||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #003) Notice of Appeal of the Decision & Order granting in part and denying in part the Motion to Dismiss |
||
December 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.