Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capchase Inc., filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Demana, Christine Louise, Mufson, Harris, Satanove, Doran Joseph, against David Sukhraj, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Joel M. Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoel M. Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 (Arbitration) - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 16, 2022ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: August 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: July 13, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 13, 2022PETITION
Date: July 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of the Notice of Entry of the Decision and Order on Motion for Preliminary Inju Affidavit of Service of the Notice of Entry of the Decision and Order on Motion for Preliminary Inju ... show more |
||
September 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service of the Notice of Entry of the Decision and Order on Motion for Preliminary In Affirmation of Service of the Notice of Entry of the Decision and Order on Motion for Preliminary In ... show more |
||
September 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Decision and Order by the Hon. Joel M. Cohen signed, filed and entered on Septemb Notice of Entry of Decision and Order by the Hon. Joel M. Cohen signed, filed and entered on Septemb ... show more |
||
September 23, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) 09/23/2022 Letter from Petitioner |
||
September 22, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Preliminary Injunction |
||
September 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF DANIEL E. ROFFMAN IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT IN LIEU OF A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AFFIDAVIT OF DANIEL E. ROFFMAN IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT IN LIEU OF A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ... show more |
||
September 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #001) Exhibit 10 - June 3, 2022 Arc Email Correspondence |
||
September 02, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT IN LIEU OF A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT IN LIEU OF A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ... show more |
||
September 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Exhibit 5 - August 10, 2022 Sukhraj Deposition Transcript Excerpt 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.