Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jeffrey Steven Tabak, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nealon, James Edward, against Jeffrey David Miller, represented by Barr, Russell D., in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ANSWER
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 10, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2020 |
ANSWER Defendant's Answer to Complaint |
||
November 23, 2020 | Affidavit of Service re Jeffrey David Miller (Personal Service) | ||
June 10, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 November 29, 2018 Letter to Miller |
||
June 10, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 December 17, 2018 Letter to Miller |
||
June 10, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 FINRA Arbitration Award |
||
June 10, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.