Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Schwed, Nathan, against Eric Braverman, Place For Achieving Total Health Medical, P.C., Total Health Nutrients, Inc., Total Health Nutrients, Llc, represented by Amato, Vincent N, Donovan, Joseph T, Mohyi, Diana Theresa, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Anil Singh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnil Singh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management379 days |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time609 days |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: September 14, 2015STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001)
Date: April 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Proof of Bankruptcy Filing |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT (Motion #001) | |
November 17, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 45EFM 2:30 ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
October 13, 2016 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 45 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
September 14, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 45 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING (Motion #001) | |
August 01, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 45EFM 10:00AM CONTROL SETTLEMENT CONF Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
August 01, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 45 10:30AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
July 15, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 45 10AM SETTLEMENT Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.