Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nageshwar Export Inc., D B A Paidiam, Paidiam Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Teske, Erin Nicole, against Hms Diamond Inc., Joseph Brack, Moshe Hirsch, S. Hirsch, Co., Steven Hirsch, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Andrea Masley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrea Masley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
September 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 16, 2022 | ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) | ||
September 14, 2022 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #009) Certified Transcript - August 30, 2022 |
||
August 31, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 30, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 26, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED) | ||
August 26, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #009) Affirmation of Tatiana Sainati |
||
August 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #009) Correspondence between Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.