Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
In Re Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Fund Securities Litigation, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kim, Phillip, Laughlin, Thomas Livezey, Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp, Scott+Scott Attorneys At Law Llp, The Rosen Law Firm, (total of 5) See All against Xxx, represented by Apps, Antonia Marie, Cabin, Michael Alexander, Callahan, Veronica Ellen, Canellos, George Speare, Coster, James J, (total of 17) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Andrew Borrok presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew Borrok Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 17, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2021STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION
Date: April 15, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 09, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: February 24, 2021STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 02, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 10, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 06, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: July 16, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 24, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 30, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 23, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 30, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #010)
Date: July 16, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2021STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: April 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 01, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #009)
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 03, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #010)
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #010) *Corrected*
Date: July 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 13, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 08, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: February 24, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004) *Corrected*
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 31, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 19, 2022ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 14, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 09, 2021STIPULATION - AS DIRECTED BY COURT
Date: July 01, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #015)
Date: September 07, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #009)
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 17, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 26, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 26, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #016)
Date: November 01, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: September 14, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 10, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: April 12, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 02, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 02, 2022STIPULATION - AS DIRECTED BY COURT
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: July 08, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #012)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #013)
Date: August 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #013)
Date: August 15, 2022STIPULATION - AS DIRECTED BY COURT
Date: July 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #012)
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: August 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #017)
Date: November 29, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 12, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #017)
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #017)
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #016)
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #016)
Date: November 01, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 26, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 30, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 30, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #015)
Date: September 07, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #016)
Date: November 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #016)
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #016)
Date: November 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #017)
Date: November 29, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 30, 2021ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED) Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 27, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 04, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 05, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: January 10, 2023MEMORANDUM
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #019) *Corrected*
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #019)
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #019)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #019)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #019)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #019)
Date: February 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #019)
Date: February 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: March 17, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 17, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 01, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 03, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Fund Accounting Servicing Agreement between Trust for Advised Portfolios and USBFS |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Fund Administration Servicing Agreement between Trust for Advised Portfolios and USBFS |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Policies and Procedures for Valuing Portfolio Securities and Assets for the Trust for Advised Portfo Policies and Procedures for Valuing Portfolio Securities and Assets for the Trust for Advised Portfo ... show more |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F November 22, 2013 Supplement to the January 31, 2013 Prospectus for the Ziegler Strategic Income Fun November 22, 2013 Supplement to the January 31, 2013 Prospectus for the Ziegler Strategic Income Fun ... show more |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K EisnerAmper LLPs Consent of Independent Registered Public Accounting Firm |
||
March 17, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM U.S. Bancorp Fund Services, LLCs Memorandum of Law Regarding Liability Under The Securities Act of 1 U.S. Bancorp Fund Services, LLCs Memorandum of Law Regarding Liability Under The Securities Act of 1 ... show more |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Charles Shercks Amended Class Action Complaint |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Investment Advisory Agreement between Infinity Q Capital Management, LLC and Trust for Advised for P Investment Advisory Agreement between Infinity Q Capital Management, LLC and Trust for Advised for P ... show more |
||
March 17, 2023 | Affirmation of Joshua A. Dunn | ||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Funds December 31, 2019 Registration Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.