Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Yadimar Pena , Individually And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bittner, Nicholas Robert, Davis, Christopher Q, Hasani, Hajar, Sweeney, Brendan, against Hornblower Cruises & Events, Llc, represented by Foreman, Adriana Hope, Freedberg, Eli Zev, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Louis L. Nock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouis L. Nock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Nyll Class Action) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
September 27, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
July 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
July 12, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
May 12, 2023 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
May 11, 2023 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
May 10, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
May 05, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
April 28, 2023 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
April 25, 2023 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.