Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Serge Wroclawski, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Lauchheimer, Aaron B, Pollack, Gayle E, against Fulton Landing, Inc., represented by Rosen, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo S. Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Morrison Cohen LLP represents Serge Wroclawski in this arbitration proceeding against Fulton Landing, Inc. (FLI). Wroclawski contracted with FLI, which was solely owned by Kent Wadhams, for a gut renovation of his home. The contract included a provis...
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 31, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
August 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Transcript of Proceedings-held May 16, 2022 before Judge Hagler |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition to Respondent's Proposed Counter Order and in Further Support of Petitioner's Proposed Order |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Proposed Order |
||
August 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Mark A. Rosen in Support of Counter Order |
||
August 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Proposed Order |
||
August 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) Affirmation of Mark A. Rosen, Esq. in Support of Counter Order |
||
June 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) New York State and New York City tax returns |
||
June 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Payroll reports substantiating the amounts owed to the employees. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.