Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Yehudah Silverstein, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rivkin, Oleg, against Cyan Management Llc, Eric Borukhin, Mb Travel Corp. D B A Downtown Travel, represented by Patias, Parmenion, Storch, Steven Gary, Yeskoo, Richard Charles, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Jennifer G. Schecter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer G. Schecter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 24, 2023ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Date: December 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2024 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
February 07, 2024 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS October 3, 2023 Transcript |
||
December 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Documents produced by defendants [Bates857-868] |
||
December 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Defendant's responses to plaintiff's document demands |
||
December 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Defendants' responses to plaintiff's interrogatories |
||
December 24, 2023 |
ANNUAL ACCOUNTING Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Accounting [ECF 122] |
||
December 04, 2023 |
ANNUAL ACCOUNTING Accounting Pursuant to the October 3, 2023 Order |
||
November 08, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
November 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
November 08, 2023 | Notice of Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.