Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aea Middle Market Debt Funding Llc, Aea Middle Market Debt Ii Funding Llc, Bancalliance Inc., Midcap Financial Trust, Midcap Funding Xviii Trust, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Aronoff, Yonaton, Leroy, Tracy N, Oppenheim, Adam Bradley, Yetter, R P, against Archway Marketing Holdings, Inc., Archway Marketing Services, Inc., Awm Holdings, Inc., Corporate Services, Inc., Field Point Agency Services, Inc., (total of 12) See All represented by Ball, David J, Carty, Christopher W., Field, Daniel Alexander, Gallaro, Russell Wallace, Goldberg, Janice Ivy, (total of 15) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa Anne Crane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management70 days |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 29, 2019STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: June 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
March 31, 2023 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
March 27, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 23, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) Order Vacating NOI (on consent) & Setting Final Amended Discovery Schedule |
||
March 17, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
March 13, 2023 | REMITTITUR | ||
March 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Decision and Order of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Appellate Division, First Judicial Decision and Order of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Appellate Division, First Judicial ... show more |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 67 (Motion #018) Redacted version of NYSCEF 513 Stockman Ex 67 |
||
March 08, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING | ||
March 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 58 (Motion #017) Redacted Version of NYSCEF 504 - Stockman Affirmation Ex. 58 - Aug. 23, 2018 Confidential Draft of A Redacted Version of NYSCEF 504 - Stockman Affirmation Ex. 58 - Aug. 23, 2018 Confidential Draft of A ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.