Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert W. Huntley, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Kalberer, Kurt T., against Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., represented by Reicher, Terri Lee, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R. Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R. Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time52 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 25, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 03, 2020PETITION
Date: January 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
January 24, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Waiver Letter |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Award |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.