Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mohammed A Bhutta, Zain Contracting, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Coren, Steven M., against Kaj Ny Construction D B A Dk Contracting, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: January 03, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 02, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 06, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: January 07, 2020PETITION *Corrected*
Date: January 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
February 04, 2020 | Motion |
COMPEL DISCLOSURE (Motion #001) Decided: 03/04/2020CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: KOTLER, LYNN R. Answer demanded: No Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 8EFM 10:00 ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - amended - Subpoena with Schedule A |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected* to Enforce OATH Subpoena |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F KAJ NY - DK Construction Project Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.