Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alfonso D Chan, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Tamir, Zaki Isaac Bahar, against New York City Police Department, Police Officer John Doe, The City Of New York, represented by Hastings, Alexandra, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Verna L Saunders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVerna L Saunders Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1314 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 14, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30AM SETTLED $1,174.00 Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
February 05, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
December 18, 2018 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
November 27, 2018 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Affirmation in Good Faith |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Note of Issue |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Plaintiff's Counsel Correspondence |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Mr. Gerard Chan's EBT Transcript |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Plaintiff's EBT Transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.