Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The People Of The State Of New York, By Letitia James, Attorney General Of The State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by New York State Office Of The Attorney General, Roque, Daniel K., Sheehan, James Grahan, Stern, Emily, Suvari, Catherine, (total of 5) See All against Diocese Of Buffalo, Edward B. Scharfenberger In His Capacity As Apostolic Administrator For The Diocese Of Buffalo, Edward M. Grosz, Richard J. Malone, represented by Geremia, Todd R, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo S. Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Breach Of Fiduciary Duty) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This is a complaint filed by the New York State Attorney General against the Diocese of Buffalo and two of its bishops, Richard Malone and Jeffrey Grob, for persistent failure to comply with laws applicable to nonprofits and mismanagement of the dioc...
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 23, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 23, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 23, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 09, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 02, 2020NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI)
Date: January 09, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: November 23, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Copies of Federal Notice of Removal |
||
January 09, 2021 |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI) Notice of removal to the United States District Court for the Soutern District of New York |
||
December 30, 2020 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001) Stipulation extending time to answer the complaint, adjourning and setting a briefing schedule for M Stipulation extending time to answer the complaint, adjourning and setting a briefing schedule for M ... show more |
||
December 14, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 02, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 23, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
November 23, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
November 23, 2020 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 23, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.