Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Xxxxx T Xxxxxxx, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Roven, Janice Gail, against Jie Zhou, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions139 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time139 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL AUTHORIZATION LETTER | ||
November 11, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 11, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 28, 2020 | Hearing |
UNCONT MAT JUDGMENT GRANTED IAS UMAT 20 10-20-20CC10-22 Judge: KAPLAN, DEBORAH ANN |
|
October 27, 2020 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
October 27, 2020 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
October 27, 2020 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
September 08, 2020 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
September 08, 2020 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
September 08, 2020 | UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL PACKET - WITH CHILDREN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.