Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Laurie A Sanchez, Norbert J Sanchez, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Meirowitz, Samuel Miles, Shukla, Kush, Shusterman, Perry Leigh, Wasserberg, Daniel Joshua, against Allied Aviation Services, Inc., American Home Assurance Company, Inc., Bmce Inc., F K A United Centrifugal Pump, Borgwarner Morse Tec Llc, Cbs Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation, (total of 25) See All represented by Berry, Jill L, Brennan, Frank, Cook, Kerryann Marie, Dean, Andrew Wayne, Dilonardo, Anna M., (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Martin Shulman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin Shulman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2015 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Cycle Time637 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2019 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 02, 2019 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Courter Executed USJM |
||
October 26, 2018 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) USJM Request |
||
February 28, 2018 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 30, 2017 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 10, 2017 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey's Executed Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
July 24, 2017 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion and Order |
||
June 29, 2017 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Georgia-Pacific LLC's Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
||
May 17, 2017 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 02, 2017 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 1 9:30AM Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.