Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hugh Mcallister, Local 621, S.E.I.U., Louis Morbelli, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Thayer, James M, against Daniel A. Nigro As Commissioner Of The New York City Fire Department, Don Nguyen As Assistant Commissioner Of The Equal Employment Opportunity Office Of The New York City Fire Department, The City Of New York, The New York City Fire Department, represented by Ernst, Leo Trevor, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time202 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: December 17, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
March 18, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 8EFM NO APPEARANCES SEE ORD.(3/3/20) Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) Respondents' Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Cross-Motion |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
March 03, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 8EFM 10:00 ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) By Hugh McAllister |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) By Louis Morbelli |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.