Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Emilio Tucci, Marta Tucci, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Iacovangelo, Francesca Ann, Walsh, Janet Catherine, against Ashland, Llc. F K A Ashland, Inc.,, Basf Corporation, Individually And As Successor In Interest To Inmont Corporation And D B A Basf-Inmont, Successor In Interest To And D B A Glasurit And R-M Company F K A Rinshed Mason Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, Icc Chemical Corporation, Ppg Industries, Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Basil, Robert J, Cohen, David Nathan, Emery, Christine Michelle, Garry, Steven Edward, Kaufman, Beth L., (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Mary V. Rosado presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary V. Rosado Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Exposure To Benzene) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 29, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: November 21, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 29, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 07, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 05, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: December 12, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 29, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 26, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 26, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: February 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 10, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 24, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 23, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 24, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: February 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 24, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 06, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 01, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 28, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 31, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 03, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: June 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: June 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: June 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 07, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: June 07, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Exhibit 7 - Ron Isger Deposition |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit 6 - Fred Urda Deposition |
||
June 07, 2023 | Notice of Motion for Consolidation | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 - June 6 2023 Letter to Counsel |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 Exhibit 8 - June 7 2023 Letter to counsel |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Exhibit 10 - Notices of Dep to Shell and DuPont |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 Exhibit 13 - Joe Powell Deposition |
||
June 07, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.