Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brian Stempeck As Trustee Of The Stempeck-Miura Family Trust, Dated April 3, 2019, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Chester, Robert Amory Myers, D'Angelo, Massimo Fabio, against Carrie Chiang, Spencer Ting, Townhouse West 83Rd, Llc, represented by Krakowsky, Joshua S, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Dakota D. Ramseur presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDakota D. Ramseur Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Fraudulent Inducement) |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Ex. A - Complaint |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Ex. B - HVAC Contractor Report |
||
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit of Brian Stempeck in Opposition to Motion |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Ex. C - HVAC Access Panel Photographs |
||
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit in Opposition to Motion |
||
February 15, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 13, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
February 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE | ||
January 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #001) Ex 7 - Emails re briefing schedule |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.