Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Luis Bolivar Coronel, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Norton, Timothy William, Payne, Steven R, Smith, Dennis R., Winograd, Richard Mark, against Southgate Owners, Corp.,, represented by Brown, Michael S, Packer, Jamie Todd, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Carol Edmead presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Edmead Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management225 days |
Filing DateApril 12, 2016 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2020 | Hearing |
EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 10:30 AM Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
April 21, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 10:30 AM SKYPE CONFERENCE Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
March 18, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
November 07, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #003) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE NOTICE Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
October 01, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR PER SOS Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 35 2:30 PM NOI FILED Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
August 27, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR PER SOS Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
July 09, 2019 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 35 2:30 PM EXP NOI 07/31/19 Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
June 28, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
May 31, 2019 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #003) Decided: 11/07/2019MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: EDMEAD, CAROL R. Answer demanded: No Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.