Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Joel Torres, filed a(n) Other Special Proceeding case represented by Sells, Derek, against The City Of New York, The New York City Police Dept., represented by Bruno, Kyle Christopher, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2015 |
CategoryOther Special Proceeding |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time235 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 04, 2015PETITION *Corrected*
Date: August 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #001) | |
September 08, 2015 | Motion |
DISCOVERY BEFORE ACT. COMMENCED (Motion #001) Decided: 11/09/2015CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: KOTLER, LYNN R. Answer demanded: No Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
September 08, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 5EFM 10:00AM 80 CENTRE STREET Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
September 07, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
September 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Court Order by Judge Anil C. Singh |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) affirmation in opposition |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
PETITION *Corrected* Petition |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *Corrected* RJI-Special Proceedings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.