Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
605 West 42Nd Street Owner Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Injunctive Relief) case represented by Zukofsky, Joshua, against Aleixi Sanchez, represented by Abrigo, Jose Idio, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Shlomo Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Injunctive Relief) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time11 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 14, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 09, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 08, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 19, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 14, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Two-Attorney Stipulation of Settlement |
||
October 19, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 19, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) TRIAL SUPPORT OFFICE 10:00 A.M. SEE NYSCEF DOC. 27 Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
October 16, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 11:30 A.M. REMOTE ARGUMENT Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 10:30 A.M. REMOTE ARGUMENT Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
October 14, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Defendant Affidavit |
||
October 14, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation In Opposition |
||
October 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendant Emails |
||
October 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Defendant Letter |
||
October 13, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.