Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ralph Nicolas, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Mermigis, James G., against The City Of New York, The New York City Police Department, represented by Linnane, Kathleen Maura, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Lori S. Sattler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLori S. Sattler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 27, 2022PETITION
Date: September 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service - Notice of Petition |
||
February 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #002) Notice of Article 78 Petition |
||
February 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EXHIBIT A - BOH Resolution + Press Release |
||
February 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Correspondence to Judge re. BOH Resolution Dated 2/9/2023 |
||
December 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 17, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of No Opposition |
||
September 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service - TRO |
||
September 28, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) O.S.C. SIGNED BY JUSTICE KAHN ON 9/27/2022 MADE RET. VIA MS TEAMS ON 10/19/2022. AT 3:00 P.M. |
||
September 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G NYC Executive Order 62 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.