Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rachel Siegel, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Saghir, Peter James, against Chauncey A. Matthews, Dollar Rent A Car Inc., Enterprise Fm Trust, Fw Webb Company, James T. Robinson, (total of 5) See All represented by Liantonio, Gaetana, Morgillo, Kenneth Robert, Shapiro, Sim R., Weakland, Shawn Michael, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Adam Silvera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam Silvera Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1553 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 11, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 16, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: April 26, 2018PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: August 29, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006)
Date: October 17, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: March 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 16, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: August 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #005)
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) (Motion #005)
Date: December 17, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 03, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 04, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 29, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: December 19, 2018REMITTITUR
Date: December 16, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005)
Date: December 10, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 01, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 16, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002)
Date: November 04, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #006)
Date: October 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 04, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: December 06, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2015DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: September 10, 2015ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: February 17, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 22, 2016ANSWER
Date: January 14, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: November 05, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 16, 2015ANSWER
Date: September 10, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: January 11, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 07, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 03, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 01, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 04, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 01, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: November 05, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: October 01, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #006)
Date: October 17, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 01, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
November 06, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 40 9:30AM NYSCEF DOC#149 Judge: KAPLAN, DEBORAH ANN |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Advising on Settlement |
|
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS TRIAL READY 40 9:30AM Judge: KAPLAN, DEBORAH ANN |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006) Order to Show Cause |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #006) Gray sheet on declined OSC |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #006) | |
October 17, 2019 | Motion |
COMPEL DISCLOSURE (Motion #006) Decided: 10/17/2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REFUSED Before Justice: KAPLAN, DEBORAH ANN Answer demanded: No Judge: KAPLAN, DEBORAH ANN |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #006) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.