Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Madeline Rivera, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Soloway, Robert, against New York City Transit Authority, represented by Berkowitz, David Evan, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Suzanne J Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzanne J Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management764 days |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Hearing |
REMOTE CONFERENCE PART REMOTE CONFERENCE Judge: ADAMS, SUZANNE J. |
|
October 08, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 9:30 AM Judge: ADAMS, SUZANNE J. |
|
June 01, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 11:00 AM SKYPE CONFERENCE Judge: ADAMS, SUZANNE J. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE STATUS CONFERENCE 21 10:00AM Judge: ADAMS, SUZANNE J. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 09, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 21 10:00AM Judge: SOKOLOFF, LISA ANN |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
October 24, 2019 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 21 10:00AM Judge: SOKOLOFF, LISA ANN |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.