Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Boris Li, filed a(n) Other Special Proceeding case represented by Lax, Emil, against The City Of New York, represented by , Markos, Dimitrios Theofanis, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryOther Special Proceeding |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time520 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2015RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2017 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) IAS PART 5 PRE ACTION RELIEF DECIDED Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R.(DCM) |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Order dated January 6, 2016 |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 13, 2015 | Motion |
DISCOVERY BEFORE ACT. COMMENCED (Motion #001) Decided: 12/08/2015SEE DECISION Before Justice: KOTLER, LYNN R.(DCM) Answer demanded: No Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R.(DCM) |
|
October 13, 2015 | Hearing |
DECISION RESERVED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 5EFM 10:00AM Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R.(DCM) |
|
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.