Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Boguslava Gwazdacz, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Asch, Ian Harris, Stein, Joshua Neil, against Adr Restaurant Inc., Moca Realty Inc., represented by Dipippo, Philip Albert, Molina, Victor Jose, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Robert R Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert R Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management197 days |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 18, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) IAS MOTION 43 10AM ORAL ARG Judge: REED, ROBERT R. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
March 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR FS/MOT Judge: REED, ROBERT R. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE (Motion #001) | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
January 30, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: REED, ROBERT R. |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) stipulation adjourning motion to March 5, 2020 |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Google map photographs |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Discovery Response |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Expert Exchange |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.