Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Meleny Safarlizadeh, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Joseph, Michael H, against David Shokrian Md, Millennial Plastic Surgery Pllc, represented by Dotz, Gadi Ian, Rosen, Gene W, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo S. Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Sexual Harassment,) |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeHarassment |
This is a complaint by the plaintiff, derivatively for herself, and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individuals, against the defendants alleging sexual harassment, sexual discrimination, and retaliation for complaining about sexual harassm...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 29, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 31, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
May 31, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
April 30, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
April 10, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
April 10, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
April 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.