Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Utica First Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Lj East Houston Llc D B A Lobster Joint, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Neonakis, Nicholas, against The City Of New York, represented by Schaefer, Nicholas Philip Pallesen, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time260 days |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: April 27, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 22, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 19, 2016 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
April 27, 2016 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | ||
April 27, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Amended Decision/Order |
||
April 25, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 25, 2016 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
April 25, 2016 |
RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) Request for Assignment to Part 5 as per Judge Kotler's Order |
||
April 22, 2016 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 25, 2015 | Motion |
LEAVE SERVE LATE NOT. OF CLAIM (Motion #001) Decided: 04/21/2016CASE DISPOSED/SETTLE ORDER Before Justice: KOTLER, LYNN R.(DCM) Answer demanded: No Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R.(DCM) |
|
August 25, 2015 | Hearing |
DECISION RESERVED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 5EFM 10:00 AM 80 CENTRE STREET Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R.(DCM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.