Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tiffany Smalls, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Seitelman, Mark E, against Essex Plaza Management Assoc., Llc, Hamilton Heights Terrace Associates, L.P., Reasonable Lock & Safe, Inc., represented by King, Thomas Joseph, Lewyn, Alfred T, Lewyn, Alfred T., in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Carol Edmead presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Edmead Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management162 days |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time673 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 20, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 20, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
June 06, 2017 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) STATUS CONFERENCE 35 SETTLED PER DEFT. Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
April 04, 2017 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 35 2:30 PM ADJ FR 3/7 BY COURT Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
March 07, 2017 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 35 2:30 PM NOI EXT 3/31/17 Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
November 29, 2016 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 35 2:30 PM PER 7/26/16 ORDER. Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Reasonable Lock Demands |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Incident report |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Photos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.