Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Digital Gadgets, Llc, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Neidl, Benjamin Fisher, against Abc Llc A Fictitious Name Used For A Limited Liability Company With A Potential Interest In The Outcome Of This Proceeding, The Identity Of Which Is Presently Unknown,, Barupon, Llc, The New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, Xyz Corporation A Fictitious Name Used For A Limited Liability Company With A Potential Interest In The Outcome Of This Proceeding, The Identity Of Which Is Presently Unknown,, represented by Turk, Susan Ann Marie, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Verna L. Saunders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVerna L. Saunders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is an Article 78 proceeding against New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation (HHC) regarding a procurement for 27,725,000 over-the-counter CoVID-19 nasal swab tests. Petitioner is seeking a permanent injunction and restraining order stayin...
NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION *Corrected*
Date: September 10, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry, attaching Decision and Order |
||
September 19, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
September 16, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) | ||
September 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B to Affirmation Pursuant to 22 NYCRR 202.8-e |
||
September 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A to Affirmation Pursuant to 22 NYCRR 202.8-e |
||
September 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation Pursuant to 22 NYCRR 202.8-e |
||
September 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION *Corrected* Affidavit of Charles Tebele in support of Article 78 Petition and Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction |
||
September 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Exhibit 10 to Petition: FTC Summary Judgment |
||
September 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 Exhibit 9 to Petition: Balaji Profile |
||
September 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit 5 to Petition: Correspondence from HHC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.