Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Cindy Hannant, Gary Hannant, Gary Hannant As Administrator Of The Estate Of Michael Hannant, Deceased, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against 855-857 Ninth Avenue Corp., Airbnb, Inc., Airbnb Stays, Inc., Airbnb Travel, Llc, Board Of Directors Of New Ninth Avenue Corp., (total of 10) See All represented by Everhart, Aaron J., Hazlett, Jenna Lynn, Impellizeri, Michael Neal, Lane, Ian Bruce, Migdalen, Jeffrey, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Lisa S. Headley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa S. Headley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Wrongful Death) |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a complaint filed in New York by Eric Abt and Robert Weinstein, individuals, and New Ninth Avenue Corp., against Airbnb, Inc., Airbnb Travel, LLC, Airbnb Stays, Inc., New Bedford Management Corp., Siren Management Corp., and the Board of Dire...
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 21, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 21, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 21, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 10, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 14, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 05, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 14, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 18, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 14, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 30, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 13, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 05, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 14, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 12, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 18, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 05, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
October 05, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Insurance Information |
||
July 18, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry |
||
June 22, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
April 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: COMBINED DEMANDS TO DEFENDANTS |
||
April 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: COMBINED DEMANDS TO PLAINTIFF |
||
April 21, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION TO DEFENDANTS |
||
April 21, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
April 21, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.