Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Louis A. Maldonado, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Zapantis, Marina, against 80 Lafayette Associates Llc, Excel Elevator & Escalator, Corp., Mayore Estates Llc, represented by Berger, Desiree Luree, Gottlieb, Michael H., Khan, Shahnewaz, Peknic, Maureen E, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo S. Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 22, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 06, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 12, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 06, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 02, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 28, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 28, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 22, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 02, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 21, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002) TT's 4-23-21 Dep Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: March 28, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 14, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002) So Ordered Stipulation |
||
June 07, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) So Ordered Stipulation |
||
May 22, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002) Amended Stipulation corrected County venue |
||
May 22, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) Amended Stipulation corrected County venue |
||
May 11, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) Stipulation adjourning s.j. motion to 7/21/23 (Berger) |
||
May 11, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002) Stipulation adjourning s.j. motion to 7/21/23 (Peknic) |
||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Third Party Summons & Complaint |
||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Ex. I Plaintiff's EBT Transcript |
||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Ex. K Glick EBT Transcript |
||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Consent of Change of Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.