Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Paulette Dyer As Administratrix Of The Estate Of William Cannon, A K A William Cannon, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rose, Michael A, against Interfaith Medical Center, Sus Foundation, Inc., represented by Conelley, Josie Marie, Hilton, Margaret Ann, Nichols, Jeffrey Robert, Slone, Ondine, Stathatos, Gerasimia, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Erika M. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErika M. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management327 days |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1460 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 11, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
January 03, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER |
||
November 16, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to Execute EBT of Bogdan Sasaran MD 10/17/22 |
||
November 16, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 13, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
July 06, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
April 27, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
March 02, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
January 27, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
October 28, 2021 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.