Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Saad Chaudhry, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Berkowitz, Robert Joseph, Weitz, Andrew Douglas, against Lesc Lp, The Lesc Foundation, Inc., The Lower East Side Service Center, Inc., represented by Toker, Matthew I, Werbel, Shelly Klausner, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Leslie Stroth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeslie Stroth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Assault-Premises) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 30, 2023DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 17, 2023 | DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT | ||
January 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service via Mail |
||
January 27, 2023 |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' correspondence date 1.26.23 e-filed without attachments |
||
November 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service via Mail |
||
November 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Supplemental Notice for D&I without attachments |
||
November 03, 2022 |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Stipulation to Withdraw |
||
November 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service via Electronic Filing |
||
November 02, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to CPLR 3017 Demand |
||
November 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Combined Discovery Response dated 10/19/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.