Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Juliet Chin, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Goodstein, Matthew Demars, against City Of New York, Long Island Railroad, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Mta New York City Transit, New York City Transit Authority, (total of 5) See All represented by Berkowitz, David Evan, Bila, Anthony, Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Dominguez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Dominguez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
January 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION POST-EBT DEMANDS |
||
August 08, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 02, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 29, 2022 | STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED | ||
July 29, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 31, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter regarding PC |
||
March 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Acevedo Order and Decision Acevedo Order and Decision Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
||
March 24, 2022 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001) no fee letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.