Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Noreen D Roth, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Burstein, Judd, Record, John-Christopher, Saburn, Joseph M., Stanton, Michael K., against Asher Rubenstein, Kenneth Rubenstein, Rubinstein & Rubenstein, L.L.P., represented by Hochberg, Shari B., Rubinstein, Kenneth, Salant, Scott M, Venditti, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management684 days |
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Professional Malpractice (Legal Malpractice) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1460 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1470 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
Date: February 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
June 17, 2020 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #003) Notice of Appeal, with supporting documents |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) verified bill of costs |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
March 23, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE PER SOS FILE IN PART Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
March 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003) Fixing Table of Contents and Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.