Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Commissioners Of State Insurance Fund, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Maidenbaum, Jeffrey A, against Nino Home Improvement Co Inc., in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Verna L. Saunders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVerna L. Saunders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2020JUDGMENT - MONEY
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT - MONEY entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 01, 2022 | ||
February 17, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) with bill of costs |
||
February 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) with decision filed on 1/31/2022 |
||
January 31, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) on our motion |
||
September 16, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
September 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #001) statements sent to def. |
||
September 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #001) application |
||
September 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #001) information and endorsement page |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.